Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ruiz Agüero

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1515Born
19 Mar 158468.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
24 May 159580.0DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ruiz Agüero
Bishop Juan Ruiz Agüero (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalavera de la Reina, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,813
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 96, Number 600
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018