Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel de la Cerda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532²Born
19 Jan 156533.0AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
24 Mar 156533.2Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
4 Jun 157442.4AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
30 Jan 157947.0ResignedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel de la Cerda:
Bishop Juan Manuel de la Cerda , Bishop Emeritus of Sigüenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 339, and Page 297
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,356
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 76, Number 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015