Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Álvarez de Toledo, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1488BornAlba de Tormes
11 Apr 150718.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Aug 152335.1AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
11 Apr 153748.7AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Dec 153850.4Elevated to Cardinal
4 May 154152.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
6 Jul 154153.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
24 Jan 154758.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
28 Feb 155061.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
27 Jun 155061.9AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
4 Dec 155163.4ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
20 Nov 155365.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
11 Dec 155365.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
29 May 155566.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
15 Sep 155769.2DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Álvarez de Toledo:
Cardinal Juan Álvarez de Toledo O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a cardinal for 18.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1538
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 36, Number 165
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 143, and Page 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013