Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Rey y Redondo

Deceased

Bishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1834Born
1860¹25.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 189460.3AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
9 Sep 189460.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
5 Sep 191783.5DiedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Rey y Redondo
Bishop Nicolás Rey y Redondo (born , died ) Bishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelgar de Fernamental, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Burgos, Archdiocese of Burgos

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017