Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Vela Becerril

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1563²Born
22 Apr 162461.3SelectedBishop of Lugo, Spain
29 Jul 162461.5ConfirmedBishop of Lugo, Spain
5 Jan 162562.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
15 Jan 163269.0SelectedBishop of Tuy, Spain
2 Aug 163269.5ConfirmedBishop of Tuy, Spain
17 May 163572.3DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Vela Becerril
Bishop Diego Vela Becerril (born 1563, died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBecerril de Campos
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,398
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 224, and Page 349
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 146, Number 932
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,941

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast