Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis (Antonio) Díaz Aux de Armendáriz, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603²Born
30 May 168178.4SelectedBishop of Alghero, Italy
1 Sep 168178.6ConfirmedBishop of Alghero, Italy
Dec 1681³78.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
18 Mar 168683.2AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
28 Jul 168986.5DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis (Antonio) Díaz Aux de Armendáriz
Archbishop Luis (Antonio) Díaz Aux de Armendáriz O. de M. (born 1603, died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTudela, Spain
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 78, and Page 136
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 222, Number 1,376
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 37
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,071

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast