Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Joaquín González de Acuña y Saenz

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1748BornPanama
24 Jul 179749.1AppointedBishop of Panamá
10 Mar 179849.7InstalledBishop of Panamá
20 Jul 181365.1DiedBishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Manuel Joaquín González de Acuña y Saenz
Bishop Manuel Joaquín González de Acuña y Saenz (born , died ) Bishop of Panamá

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016