Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Calderón de León

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1540Born
29 Oct 159353.8AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
Dec 1597²57.9Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
23 May 159858.3AppointedBishop of Panamá
4 Jul 160565.5AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1621²81.0DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Calderón de León
Bishop Antonio Calderón de León (born 1540, died 1621) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaeza, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santa Fe de Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,367
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 268, and Page 278
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 107, Number 677
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018