Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Valdivieso Miranda

Bishop of Chitré


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1968 BornDavid
16 Dec 199527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Panamá
25 Apr 201345.1AppointedBishop of Chitré, Panama
6 Jul 201345.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chitré, Panama

MicroData Summary for Rafael Valdivieso Miranda:
Bishop Rafael Valdivieso Miranda (born ) Bishop of Chitré

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chitré.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2013
  • ob: CB, 25 Apr 2013
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,834

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015