Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco del Rosario Manfredo y Ballestas

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1781BornCartagena
1805¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 184563.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Panamá
24 Apr 184563.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
8 Dec 184564.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
16 Apr 184765.7SucceededBishop of Panamá
10 Mar 184866.6InstalledBishop of Panamá
21 Apr 185068.7DiedBishop of Panamá

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco del Rosario Manfredo y Ballestas:
Bishop Juan Francisco del Rosario Manfredo y Ballestas (born , died ) Bishop of Panamá

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 274, and Page 297

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013