Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Fita y Carrión (y Lafita)

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1740Born
28 Mar 180362.4AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
8 Jan 180463.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
24 May 180463.6DiedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Fita y Carrión (y Lafita) (VIAF: 46696361)
Bishop Francisco Javier Fita y Carrión (y Lafita) (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChunchi
Ordained Bishopéglise Carmen antiguo, Quito, Diocese of Quito

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 159
  • ob: CB, 9 Sep 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,047

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast