Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan de Dios Campuzano, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Galápagos, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1921Born
8 Aug 193816.9EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jun 194624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Nov 195938.2AppointedPrefect of Galápagos, Ecuador
30 Oct 196746.1ResignedPrefect of Galápagos, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Juan de Dios Campuzano
Father Juan de Dios Campuzano O.F.M. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Galápagos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast