Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Sotomayor, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1623AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
18 Dec 1623AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
18 Aug 1624Ordained BishopBishop of Quito, Ecuador
5 Jun 1628AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
5 Feb 1630DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Sotomayor:
Archbishop Francisco Sotomayor O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 282
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 145, Number 924

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015