Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pedro Pablo (Luis Reinaldo) Andrade Sánchez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Galápagos, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1892Born
8 May 191219.8EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 May 191320.8Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
13 May 191623.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
3 Apr 192128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 Apr 195158.7AppointedPrefect of Galápagos, Ecuador
195966.5ResignedPrefect of Galápagos, Ecuador
22 Nov 197381.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of Galápagos, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Pedro Pablo (Luis Reinaldo) Andrade Sánchez
Father Pedro Pablo (Luis Reinaldo) Andrade Sánchez O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Galápagos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 52.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • ab: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast