Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Lorenzo Stehle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo de los Colorados, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1926Born
24 Jun 195124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Essen, Germany
16 Jul 198356.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
16 Jul 198356.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea
25 Sep 198357.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea
5 Jan 198760.3AppointedPrelate of Santo Domingo de los Colorados, Ecuador
8 Aug 199669.9AppointedBishop of Santo Domingo de los Colorados, Ecuador
11 May 200275.6RetiredBishop of Santo Domingo de los Colorados, Ecuador
16 May 201790.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo de los Colorados, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Emilio Lorenzo Stehle (VIAF: 220652360)
Bishop Emilio Lorenzo Stehle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santo Domingo de los Colorados

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMühlhausen-Erdwangen
Death PlaceKonstanz, Germany

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 17 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017