Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Lasso de la Vega

Deceased

Bishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1764BornSantiago de Veragua
179227.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181651.4AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
11 Dec 181652.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
15 Dec 182864.2AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
16 Apr 183166.5DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Rafael Lasso de la Vega:
Bishop Rafael Lasso de la Vega (born , died ) Bishop of Quito

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 186, and Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013