Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Buenaventura Arias Bergara

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mérida

Titular Bishop of Ierichus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1772³BornEl Arenal
1797¹24.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 182654.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela
2 Oct 182654.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ierichus
19 Aug 182755.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ierichus
22 Dec 182856.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mérida, Venezuela
21 Nov 183159.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Mérida, Venezuela

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Buenaventura Arias Bergara:
Bishop José Buenaventura Arias Bergara (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mérida

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,417
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013