Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ramón Ignacio Méndez

Deceased

Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1775²BornBarinas
1797²22.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 182752.4AppointedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
18 Feb 182853.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
6 Aug 183964.6DiedArchbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Ignacio Méndez:
Archbishop Ramón Ignacio Méndez (died ) Archbishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013