Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vicente de Unda

Deceased

Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1777Born
8 Mar 180023.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 183659.4AppointedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
27 Nov 183659.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
19 Jul 184063.4DiedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Vicente de Unda
Bishop José Vicente de Unda (born , died ) Bishop of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuanare

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018