Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Bautista Sacristán y Galiano

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1759BornMaranchón, Spain
20 Aug 180445.1AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
Jun 1810³50.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
1 Feb 181757.5DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Sacristán y Galiano:
Archbishop Juan Bautista Sacristán y Galiano (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1810, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 194
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 129, Number 690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015