Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín de Ugarte y Sarabia

Deceased

Bishop of Quito


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1629AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
2 Dec 1630AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
24 Aug 1631Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
19 Nov 1640AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
21 Oct 1647AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
6 Dec 1650DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Agustín de Ugarte y Sarabia:
Bishop Agustín de Ugarte y Sarabia (died ) Bishop of Quito

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 93, and Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 199, and Page 290
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 7 Mar 2015