Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspar de Villarroel, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹Born
1607²20.0EnteredMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
Oct 1608³21.7ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Apr 163750.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
2 May 163851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
Nov 1638³51.8InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
11 Dec 165164.9AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
27 Jan 165972.0AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
166073.0InstalledArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
15 Oct 166578.7DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar de Villarroel (VIAF: 13103890)
Archbishop Gaspar de Villarroel O.E.S.A. (born 1587, died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito

  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,896
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 93, and Page 282
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017