Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Ortega y Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Feb 1645SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
21 Aug 1645ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
30 Sep 1646Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
16 Dec 1647AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
27 Nov 1651AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
1658DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Ortega y Sotomayor:
Bishop Pedro de Ortega y Sotomayor , Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,969
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,704
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 93, and Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 28 Dec 2013