Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Santander y Villavicencio

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1768Born
2 Oct 181850.2AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
21 Mar 181950.7Ordained BishopBishop of Quito, Ecuador
29 Apr 182455.8SelectedBishop of Jaca, Spain
24 May 182455.9ConfirmedBishop of Jaca, Spain
27 May 182859.9SelectedBishop of Astorga, Spain
23 Jun 182860.0ConfirmedBishop of Astorga, Spain
30 Apr 183263.8DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Santander y Villavicencio
Bishop Leonardo Santander y Villavicencio (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 93, and Page 218
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 316
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 138, Number 741
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018