Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nieto Polo del Aguila

Deceased

Bishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1703¹BornPopayan
21 Mar 174340.2SelectedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
15 Jul 174340.5ConfirmedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
28 Oct 174441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
17 Aug 174643.6SelectedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
28 Nov 174643.9ConfirmedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
12 Mar 175956.1DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Nieto Polo del Aguila:
Bishop Juan Nieto Polo del Aguila (born 1703, died ) Bishop of Quito

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 278, and Page 351
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015