Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis López de Solís, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534²BornSalamanca, Spain
1558²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
7 Sep 159258.7AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
3 Apr 159460.3Ordained BishopBishop of Quito, Ecuador
18 Jul 160571.5AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
5 Jul 160672.5DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis López de Solís:
Archbishop Luis López de Solís O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 106, Number 671
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 280
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 282
  • bd/op: CB, 17 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014