Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Trexo y Senabria, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹Born
15606.0ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1576²22.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Mar 159440.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
16 May 159541.3Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
24 Dec 161460.9DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Trexo y Senabria (VIAF: 67636154)
Bishop Fernando Trexo y Senabria O.F.M. Obs. (born 1554, died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsunción, Paraguay
Ordained BishopQuito, Diocese of Quito, Ecuador

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 320
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 348
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018