Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Fermín de Vergara, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1676³BornSan Martino de Abaixo, Spain
19 Dec 173256.3AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
1735²58.4Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
22 Sep 174064.1SelectedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
12 Dec 174064.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
7 Feb 174467.5DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Fermín de Vergara:
Archbishop Diego Fermín de Vergara O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 53, Number 229
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 216, and Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015