Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Arteaga Yepes

Deceased

Bishop of Espinal, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1925Born
19 Jul 195328.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 196237.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Popayán, Colombia
12 Sep 196237.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzegera
11 Nov 196237.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzegera
24 Jul 196540.4AppointedBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
25 Oct 198560.7AppointedBishop of Espinal, Colombia
30 Oct 198964.7DiedBishop of Espinal, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Arteaga Yepes
Bishop Alfonso Arteaga Yepes (born , died ) Bishop of Espinal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDon Matías

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018