Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego del Corro

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1706Born
15 Nov 175145.1SelectedBishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
24 Jan 175245.3ConfirmedBishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
11 Jul 175245.8Ordained BishopBishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
13 Mar 175851.4AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
28 Jan 176154.3DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Diego del Corro
Archbishop Diego del Corro (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lķcar de Barrameda

  • a bishop for 8.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,878
  • b: Episcopologio EspaŮol, Volume 1,700, Page 71, Number 340
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1752, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 262, and Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast