Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Castro Lalupú

Auxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru

Titular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1973 Born
6 Jun 200430.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Peru
4 Apr 202046.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru
4 Apr 202046.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena
29 Sep 202047.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Francisco Castro Lalupú
Bishop Francisco Castro Lalupú (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDistretto di Bellavista-Sullana, Archdiocese of Piura
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Trujillo, Archdiocese of Trujillo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Trujillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Sep 2020
  • c3: CB, 29 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 29 Sep 2020

Quantcast