Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Javier Travieso Martín, C.M.F.

Vicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Tubusuptu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1952 BornDon Benito, Spain
19 Mar 197624.1ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
26 Jun 197624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
7 Jan 200956.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trujillo, Peru
7 Jan 200956.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubusuptu
25 Mar 200957.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubusuptu
1 Nov 201462.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Javier Travieso Martín:
Bishop José Javier Travieso Martín C.M.F. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of San José del Amazonas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,076
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 1 Nov 2014