Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Baltazar Jaime Martínez de Compañón

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1737BornCabredo, Spain
1 Jun 177841.4AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
25 Mar 177942.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
15 Dec 178851.9AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
17 Aug 179760.6DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Baltazar Jaime Martínez de Compañón
Archbishop Baltazar Jaime Martínez de Compañón (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 94, Number 487
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 216, and Page 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 12 Mar 2016