Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo José de Fraga y Márquez

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1738Born
29 Mar 179051.9AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
12 Sep 179052.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
22 Mar 179354.9DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Anselmo José de Fraga y Márquez
Bishop Anselmo José de Fraga y Márquez (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartagena

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,790, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast