Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cándido Manuel de Torrijos Riguerra, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mérida, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1735Born
17 Aug 179155.8SelectedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
19 Dec 179156.2ConfirmedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
21 Apr 179357.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mérida, Venezuela
20 Nov 179459.1DiedBishop of Mérida, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Cándido Manuel de Torrijos Riguerra
Bishop Cándido Manuel de Torrijos Riguerra O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Mérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSesquilé, Colombia

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 208
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018