Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Diaz de Cabrera y Córdoba, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1611AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
6 Oct 1614AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
26 Apr 1620DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Francisco Diaz de Cabrera y Córdoba:
Bishop Francisco Diaz de Cabrera y Córdoba O.P. (died ) Bishop of Trujillo

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 128, Number 819
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 286, and Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 28 Dec 2013