Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Videla del Pino

Deceased

Bishop of Salta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1741BornCórdoba
1765¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 180260.7AppointedBishop of Paraguay
22 Sep 180361.8Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay
27 Oct 180664.9SelectedBishop of Salta, Argentina
23 Mar 180765.3ConfirmedBishop of Salta, Argentina
23 Aug 180967.7InstalledBishop of Salta, Argentina
17 Mar 181977.3DiedBishop of Salta, Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Videla del Pino:
Bishop Nicolás Videla del Pino (born , died ) Bishop of Salta

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,683
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 91, and Page 330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013