Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Horacio Arturo Gómez Dávila

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Rioja, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Ruspae

Titular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1913Born
18 Sep 194329.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 195844.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
13 Jun 195844.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
31 Aug 195844.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
13 Feb 196046.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of La Rioja, Argentina
22 Feb 196450.2SucceededBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
3 Jul 196854.6ResignedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
3 Jul 196854.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
15 Sep 197460.8DiedBishop Emeritus of La Rioja, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Horacio Arturo Gómez Dávila
Bishop Horacio Arturo Gómez Dávila (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Rioja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018