Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Audino Rodríguez y Olmos

Deceased

Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1888Born
30 Oct 191224.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 192738.7AppointedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
16 Oct 192739.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
29 Oct 192739.1InstalledBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
3 Nov 193951.1AppointedArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
20 Apr 194051.5InstalledArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
3 Aug 196576.8DiedArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Audino Rodríguez y Olmos
Archbishop Audino Rodríguez y Olmos (born , died ) Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Santa Rosa

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018