Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vicente Ramírez de Arellano

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1797Born
3 Jan 182426.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Jan 182426.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 185861.1AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
7 Aug 185961.7Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
22 Aug 186062.8InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
31 Aug 187375.8DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Ramírez de Arellano
Bishop José Vicente Ramírez de Arellano (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)
Ordained BishopParaná, Diocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 226
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017