Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Buenaventura Rizo Patrón, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Salta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1811BornCatamarca
22 Nov 183019.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
9 Aug 183321.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
10 Aug 183321.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Jul 186048.8AppointedBishop of Salta, Argentina
7 Apr 186149.5Ordained BishopBishop of Salta, Argentina
7 Jul 186149.8InstalledBishop of Salta, Argentina
13 Nov 188473.1DiedBishop of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Buenaventura Rizo Patrón:
Bishop Buenaventura Rizo Patrón O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Salta

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 494

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013