Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Lascano y Castillo

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1777¹Born
27 Dec 180023.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
20 Aug 180124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
19 Oct 183053.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
19 Oct 183053.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Pontica
30 Oct 183154.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Pontica
11 Jul 183659.5AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
30 Jul 183659.5DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benito Lascano y Castillo
Bishop Benito Lascano y Castillo (born 1777, died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 157, and Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018