Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bravo Dávila y Cartagena

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1629BornCuzco
29 Aug 168758.0SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
24 Nov 168758.2ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
21 Nov 168859.2Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
4 Dec 169061.2DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Bravo Dávila y Cartagena:
Bishop Juan Bravo Dávila y Cartagena (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 230, Number 1,429
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 393

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015