Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Hurtado de Mendoza

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Córdoba (Tucumán)

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1776³BornCordoba
12 May 179922.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 180023.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184265.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
27 Jan 184265.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
1851¹74.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Hurtado de Mendoza
Father José Hurtado de Mendoza (born , died 1851) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a priest for 50.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 161
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016