Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Inocencio Dávila y Matos

Deceased

Bishop of Catamarca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1874BornSanta Rosa
28 Nov 189723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
25 May 191440.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
25 May 191440.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ostracine
28 Oct 191440.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ostracine
7 Jul 192753.2AppointedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
9 Oct 192753.5InstalledBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
30 Apr 193056.0DiedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Inocencio Dávila y Matos:
Bishop Inocencio Dávila y Matos (born , died ) Bishop of Catamarca

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015