Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Calixto Gregorio Romero y Juárez

Deceased

Bishop of Salta, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1862Born
30 May 188623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salta, Argentina
18 Feb 191451.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina
18 Feb 191451.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
29 Oct 191452.0AppointedBishop of Salta, Argentina
24 Feb 191552.3Ordained BishopBishop of Salta, Argentina
17 Aug 191956.8DiedBishop of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Calixto Gregorio Romero y Juárez
Bishop José Calixto Gregorio Romero y Juárez (born , died ) Bishop of Salta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalta, Diocese of Salta
Ordained BishopSalta, Diocese of Salta

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1915, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 366, and Page 327
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast