Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás de la Torre Gibaja, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570BornMadrid, Spain
30 Mar 162050.2AppointedBishop of Paraguay
15 Aug 162151.6Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay
3 Sep 162858.7SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
11 Dec 162858.9ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
17 Jul 163060.5DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Tomás de la Torre Gibaja:
Bishop Tomás de la Torre Gibaja O.P. (died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 98, and Page 348
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 6 Jan 2014