Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Pérez de Grado

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Sep 1615AppointedBishop of Paraguay
1616²Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay
18 Mar 1619AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
4 Sep 1627DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Pérez de Grado:
Bishop Lorenzo Pérez de Grado (died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 98, and Page 170
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 134, Number 860

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015