Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Corral Peláez, S.V.D.

Bishop of Añatuya, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1968 Born
1987²18.3EnteredMember of Society of the Divine Word
20 Feb 198920.5First VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
20 Feb 199627.5Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
21 Feb 199627.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of the Divine Word
1 Mar 199728.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 Jul 201950.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Añatuya, Argentina
31 Aug 201951.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Añatuya, Argentina
16 Oct 201951.1SucceededBishop of Añatuya, Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Luis Corral Peláez
Bishop José Luis Corral Peláez S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Añatuya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopCentro de Convenciones, Añatuya, Diocese of Añatuya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Añatuya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2019
  • b: CB, 19 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 30 Jul 2019
  • c2+: CB, 1 Aug 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,235
  • s: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 16 Oct 2019

Quantcast