Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Eduardo Alvarez

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1810Born
Oct 1833³22.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 187665.4AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
16 Jul 187665.7Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
24 Aug 187867.8DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Eduardo Alvarez
Bishop Manuel Eduardo Alvarez (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,926
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017